Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/13/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/14/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 10/14/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/14/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/14/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 10/14/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 10/24/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 10/24/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/24/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/24/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/01/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/01/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 11/01/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/01/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 11/01/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/01/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/01/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/04/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/04/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/04/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/04/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/04/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/04/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/04/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/18/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/18/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/18/2011