Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/20/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/20/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/23/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/23/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/04/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/11/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/24/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/14/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/30/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/19/2012