Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 09/13/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 09/13/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/20/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/20/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/20/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/20/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/20/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/20/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/20/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/22/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/03/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/03/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/03/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/03/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/03/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/03/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/13/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/14/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/26/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/15/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/29/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/29/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/29/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/01/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/01/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/06/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/15/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/15/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/20/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/20/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/20/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/26/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 06/26/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/27/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/11/2012