Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/24/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/24/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/24/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/26/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/26/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/26/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/26/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 10/26/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/26/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/26/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/26/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/26/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 10/26/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/26/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/01/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/01/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/01/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/01/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/01/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/01/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/01/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/01/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/01/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/01/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/01/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/03/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/03/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/04/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/14/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/14/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/14/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/14/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/14/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 11/18/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 11/29/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 11/29/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/29/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/29/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/29/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/30/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/13/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/13/2011