Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/15/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/18/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/18/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/18/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/18/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/18/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/18/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/18/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/18/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/18/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/18/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/18/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/18/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/18/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/18/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/18/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/18/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/19/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/19/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/18/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/18/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/18/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 07/18/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/18/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/18/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/19/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/19/2012