Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 01/20/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/20/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/20/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/20/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 01/20/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/20/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/20/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/20/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/20/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/20/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 01/20/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/20/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/20/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/20/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/24/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/24/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 01/24/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/10/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 08/16/2011