Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 06/24/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/11/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/12/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/21/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/29/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/12/2011