Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/15/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 06/15/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 06/15/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/01/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 07/12/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/12/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 08/12/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/08/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/14/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/18/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/30/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew