Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/14/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/14/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/14/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/14/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/22/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/22/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/22/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/22/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/22/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/22/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/22/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/22/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 06/22/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/07/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/07/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/07/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/07/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/07/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/14/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/15/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/15/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 08/12/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/12/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 08/12/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/11/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/30/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/12/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/14/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/10/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/24/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/09/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/19/2012