Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 06/03/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/23/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/23/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/07/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/07/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 07/11/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/11/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/14/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/26/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/09/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/09/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/09/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/09/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/15/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/24/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/25/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/14/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 11/14/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/14/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/29/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/29/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/29/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/14/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/14/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/14/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/16/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/16/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/07/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/09/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 02/09/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/15/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/21/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/28/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 02/28/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/28/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/01/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/16/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/16/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/08/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/08/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/08/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/08/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/16/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/29/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/29/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/05/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/05/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/07/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/07/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/07/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/19/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/20/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/27/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/27/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/27/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 06/27/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/27/2012
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/29/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/10/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/10/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/10/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/10/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 07/10/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/17/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/19/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/19/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/19/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/31/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 07/31/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/31/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 08/01/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 08/02/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/10/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/20/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/21/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/09/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/30/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 11/13/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/04/2012