Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 05/23/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/25/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/25/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/25/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/25/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/31/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 06/02/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/24/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 07/07/2011