Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/03/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/03/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/13/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/23/2011