Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/07/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/12/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/12/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/12/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/13/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/14/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/14/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/03/2011