Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/07/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/07/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/07/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/07/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/07/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/18/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/18/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/18/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/18/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/19/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/24/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/25/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/26/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/08/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/08/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/11/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/01/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/05/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/02/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/04/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/04/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/04/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/04/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/04/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/10/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/10/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/10/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/12/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/12/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/12/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/12/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/12/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/12/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/12/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/12/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/12/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/12/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/12/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/12/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/12/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/12/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/12/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/12/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/24/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/24/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/13/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/21/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/28/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/30/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/17/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/17/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/06/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/18/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 07/09/2012