Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/31/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/06/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/14/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 06/26/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/11/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/11/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/11/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/11/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/11/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/11/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/11/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 12/11/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/11/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/11/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/11/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 12/11/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/11/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/11/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/11/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/11/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/11/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/11/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/11/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/11/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/11/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/11/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/11/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/11/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/11/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 12/13/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/13/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/13/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/13/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/13/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/13/2012