Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/14/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/14/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/21/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/13/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/25/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/23/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/23/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/06/2012