Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/06/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/06/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/06/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/06/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/06/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/06/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/06/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 01/06/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 01/06/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/06/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/06/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/06/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 01/06/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/06/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/06/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/12/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/12/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/12/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 01/12/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/12/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/18/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 02/15/2011