Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/03/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/03/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/03/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/03/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 03/03/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/03/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/09/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/10/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/16/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/29/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/29/2011