Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/01/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/02/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/10/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/10/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/29/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 03/29/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/29/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/30/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/01/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/05/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/07/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/07/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/08/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/08/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/15/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/04/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/04/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/04/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/23/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/23/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/23/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/23/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/23/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/23/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/25/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/31/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/31/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/13/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/13/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/13/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/13/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/22/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/07/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/12/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/12/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/13/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/14/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/15/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/25/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/25/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/25/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/01/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 08/01/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 08/01/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/01/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 08/01/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/12/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 08/12/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 08/12/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 08/19/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 08/19/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 08/26/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/30/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/08/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/13/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 09/13/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/13/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 09/14/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/20/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/22/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/25/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/25/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 10/25/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 11/03/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/15/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 11/15/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/18/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 12/02/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 12/08/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 12/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/12/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 12/12/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/10/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/27/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 02/08/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/09/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/28/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/01/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/20/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/26/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/24/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 05/16/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/16/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/05/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/15/2012
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/15/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/15/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/21/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/26/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/27/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/09/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/10/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/11/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/17/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/18/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/30/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/30/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 07/30/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/31/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 08/02/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/02/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/10/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 09/10/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 09/10/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/10/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/13/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 09/13/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/14/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/19/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/19/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/19/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/13/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/04/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/04/2012