Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/14/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 10/25/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 10/25/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/25/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/26/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/26/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/02/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 11/02/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 11/02/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 11/02/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/06/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/19/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/18/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/04/2012