Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/22/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/22/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/22/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/22/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/22/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/22/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 06/22/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/19/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/19/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/22/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/22/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/26/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/27/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/27/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/29/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/05/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 08/05/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 08/05/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 08/30/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/12/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/12/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/13/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/13/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/13/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/14/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/15/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 09/23/2011
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/03/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/14/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 11/14/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/06/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/27/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew