Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/18/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/18/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/28/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/28/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/03/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/03/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/03/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/16/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/16/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/16/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/03/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/03/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/12/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 05/25/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/25/2011