Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/12/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/26/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/17/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/29/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew