Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/19/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 08/01/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew