Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/19/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/26/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/26/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 02/10/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/19/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 07/26/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew