Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 01/19/2011
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/10/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 02/10/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/18/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/26/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew