Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 01/19/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 01/26/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/26/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/10/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/17/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/10/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/29/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew