Refine your search

Date Major Actions
09/28/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-175.
09/28/2012 Signed by President.
09/25/2012 Presented to President.
09/22/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 62 - 30. Record Vote Number: 199.
09/13/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 329 - 91 (Roll no. 579).(text: CR H5949-5953)
09/10/2012 Introduced in House