Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 06/18/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/18/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/18/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/18/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/18/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/18/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/18/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/18/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/18/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/18/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/19/2012
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/19/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/19/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 07/19/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/19/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 07/19/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/19/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/19/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/19/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/19/2012
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 07/25/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/25/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/25/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/25/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/30/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/30/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 07/30/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/30/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/30/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/02/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 08/02/2012