Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/27/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/17/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/23/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 09/10/2012