Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 06/05/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 06/05/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/07/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/12/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/12/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/12/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/19/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/19/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/19/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/19/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/19/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/19/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/19/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/19/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/19/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/19/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/27/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 06/27/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/27/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/27/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/27/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 06/27/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/27/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/27/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/27/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/27/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/29/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/29/2012
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/09/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/09/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/10/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/12/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/17/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/18/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/23/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/23/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/31/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/10/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 09/10/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/20/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/20/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/23/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 10/23/2012