Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 02/17/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/28/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 02/28/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/28/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/29/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/06/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/06/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/06/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 03/20/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 04/25/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/10/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/18/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/18/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/30/2012