Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 01/12/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 01/19/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/26/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/10/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/10/2011