Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 01/12/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 01/12/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/12/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 01/19/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/19/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/19/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/19/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/19/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 01/19/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/26/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 01/26/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/26/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/26/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 01/26/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/26/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/26/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 01/26/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 01/26/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/26/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 02/10/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/10/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 02/10/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/10/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 02/10/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/10/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/10/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/17/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/18/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/18/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 02/18/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/10/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 03/10/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/14/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/14/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/02/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/02/2011