Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 12/01/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 12/02/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 12/05/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/08/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/08/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/13/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/14/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/15/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 12/15/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/19/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/19/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/10/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 02/16/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/28/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/28/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/01/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/01/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/05/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/05/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/05/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/06/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/07/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/07/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 03/07/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/19/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/19/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/19/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/19/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/19/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/20/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/20/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 03/21/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/21/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/22/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/28/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/28/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/30/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/30/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/16/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/27/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 05/08/2012
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/09/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/19/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/17/2012