Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 08/01/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/19/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 08/19/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/19/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 08/19/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 08/19/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/19/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/19/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 08/19/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/19/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 08/19/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 08/19/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 08/19/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/19/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 08/19/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 08/19/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 08/19/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/02/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/02/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/02/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/02/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/02/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/02/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/02/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/02/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/02/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/02/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/08/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/08/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/08/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/08/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/08/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/08/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/08/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/15/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/15/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/15/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/15/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/20/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/03/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 10/04/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/04/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/05/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/05/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/11/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/11/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/11/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 10/13/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/24/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/24/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/24/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/24/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/24/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/24/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/24/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/24/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/24/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/24/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/25/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/25/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/25/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/25/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 10/26/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/31/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/31/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 11/15/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/06/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/24/2012