Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/04/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/04/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/10/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/10/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/11/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/12/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/24/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/21/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/21/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/21/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/21/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/23/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/23/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/23/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/24/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/11/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/11/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/13/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 07/13/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/15/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/18/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/14/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/28/2012