Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/08/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/08/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/08/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/08/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 03/08/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/08/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 03/08/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/08/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 03/08/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/08/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/08/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/08/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/08/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/08/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/08/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/08/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/11/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/11/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/11/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/11/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 03/11/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/11/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/11/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/11/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/11/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/11/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/11/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/11/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/11/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/11/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/11/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/11/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/11/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 03/11/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/11/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/11/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/11/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/11/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/11/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/11/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/11/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/15/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/15/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/15/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 03/15/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/15/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/15/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/15/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/15/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/15/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/15/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/15/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/16/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/17/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/30/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/13/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/03/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/05/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/10/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/10/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/10/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/12/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/13/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/24/2011
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 05/24/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/24/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/25/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/26/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/26/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/01/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/22/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/22/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/23/2011