Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 02/28/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/28/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/28/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/28/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/28/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/28/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 02/28/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/03/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/03/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/03/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/03/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/03/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/03/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/03/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/03/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/03/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/03/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/03/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/03/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/03/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/03/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/03/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/03/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/03/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/03/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 03/03/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 03/11/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/11/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/11/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/11/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/11/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/11/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/11/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/11/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/17/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/17/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/17/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/17/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/17/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/17/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/01/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/01/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/01/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/01/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/01/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 04/13/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/13/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/13/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/13/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/15/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/13/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/13/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/23/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/23/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/23/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 06/23/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/23/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 06/23/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/23/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 06/23/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/15/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 07/15/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/15/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/02/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 09/22/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/05/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 12/03/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 12/03/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 12/05/2012