Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (02/17/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the House adjourns on the legislative day of Thursday, February 17, 2011, Friday, February 18, 2011, or Saturday, February 19, 2011, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Monday, February 28, 2011.

Declares that when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Thursday, February 17, 2011, through Friday, February 25, 2011, it stand recessed or adjourned until noon on Monday, February 28, 2011.