Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/26/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/08/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/11/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/11/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/11/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/16/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/16/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/17/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/28/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/03/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/03/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/03/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/11/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/11/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/11/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/11/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/11/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/11/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/11/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/11/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/11/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/11/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/16/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/16/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/16/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/16/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/16/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/16/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/16/2011