Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/08/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/08/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 06/08/2012
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/18/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/19/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/19/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/19/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/19/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/19/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/19/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/20/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/20/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/20/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/21/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 06/21/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/21/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/21/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/21/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/26/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/26/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/26/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/26/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/26/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/26/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/26/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/26/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/26/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/26/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/26/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 06/26/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/26/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/26/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/26/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 06/26/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/27/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/27/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/27/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 06/27/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/27/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/27/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/28/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/28/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/28/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/28/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 06/28/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/28/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 06/28/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 07/09/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/09/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/09/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 07/10/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/18/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/18/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/18/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/19/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/23/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/24/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/31/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 08/01/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 08/02/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 08/02/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/10/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/10/2012
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/11/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/12/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/13/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/13/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/14/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/19/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/19/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/19/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/19/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/19/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 09/19/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/19/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/20/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/20/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/21/2012