Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 01/25/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/08/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/08/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/08/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/08/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/08/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/08/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/08/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/08/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/08/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 02/08/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/08/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/17/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/17/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/17/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/17/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/17/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/17/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/17/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/17/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/17/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 02/17/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/17/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/17/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/17/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/03/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/03/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/03/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/03/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/03/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/03/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/03/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/03/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 03/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/03/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/11/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/11/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/11/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/11/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/11/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/11/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/11/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/11/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/11/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/16/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/16/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/16/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/16/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/16/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/30/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/15/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/04/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 05/04/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/04/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/04/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/23/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/23/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/23/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/23/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 05/23/2011