Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/18/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/25/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/25/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/25/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/27/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/18/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/30/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 06/18/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/27/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/11/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/11/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/11/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/11/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/11/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/18/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/18/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/18/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/18/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/23/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/25/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/25/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/25/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/31/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/31/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/31/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/31/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 09/11/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 09/13/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/13/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/19/2012
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/19/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/21/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/21/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/21/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/21/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/21/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/15/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/15/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 11/15/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/11/2012