Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/29/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/29/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9]* 03/29/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 03/29/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 03/29/2012
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 04/19/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/19/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/19/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/19/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/19/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 04/19/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 04/19/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/19/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/19/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/19/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/19/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/25/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/25/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 04/25/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 04/25/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/25/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/25/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/25/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/25/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/25/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/25/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/25/2012
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/25/2012
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/25/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/26/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 04/26/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/26/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/10/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/10/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/10/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/10/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/26/2012