Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/16/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/16/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/16/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/01/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/01/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/01/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/01/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/01/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/01/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/01/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/06/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/24/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/16/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/31/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/01/2012