Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/10/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 03/10/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/10/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/10/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 03/15/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/15/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/31/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/31/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/31/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/08/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/04/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/04/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/04/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/04/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/04/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/04/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 05/04/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/12/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/12/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/12/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/13/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/13/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 06/15/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/15/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/15/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/15/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 07/12/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/12/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/12/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/22/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 08/01/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/12/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/21/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/29/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/05/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/02/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/02/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/21/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/21/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/30/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/27/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/09/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/13/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/23/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/31/2012