Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/06/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/21/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/23/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/22/2011