Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/09/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/09/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/09/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/09/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/10/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/10/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/14/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/05/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/01/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/02/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/14/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/16/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/16/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/07/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/15/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/21/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 08/12/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/07/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/08/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/15/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/26/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/29/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 10/11/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/31/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 11/01/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 11/01/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 11/02/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/06/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 01/23/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/26/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/07/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/16/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 11/13/2012