Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/09/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/30/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/02/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/02/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/02/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/03/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 05/03/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/10/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/11/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 05/13/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/23/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/24/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/24/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 05/24/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/24/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/25/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/31/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/02/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/15/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/15/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/16/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/16/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/16/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/21/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/21/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/06/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/06/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/18/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 08/09/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 08/09/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/07/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/16/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/06/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/20/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/12/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 07/31/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/10/2012